blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970603

EP0970603 - Litter and drying agents for litter comprising water retaining agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bio Stim
3 rue Basse Madeleine
22230 Merdrignac / FR
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Guillermou, Marc
La Raudelée
35190 La Baussaime / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Nevant, Marc, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Nevant, Marc, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2000/02]Nevant, Marc, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date99401665.705.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateFR1998000874108.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808741
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970603
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A01K1/015
[2000/02]
CPC:
A01K1/0154 (EP); A01K1/0152 (EP); A01K1/0155 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:Streu und Trockenmittel für Streu auf der Basis von wasserhaltigen Mitteln[2000/02]
English:Litter and drying agents for litter comprising water retaining agents[2000/02]
French:Litières et asséchants de litière à base d'hydrorétenteurs[2000/02]
Examination procedure10.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
01.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2004Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
29.03.2004Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
01.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/07]
15.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2003
31.07.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5664523  (FUJIURA YOJI ET AL) [X] 1-7,9-12 * column 2, line 57 - line 58 * * column 4, line 30 - line 44 * * column 6, line 16 - line 27; example -; table - *;
 [AX]US4914066  (WOODRUM GUY T) [A] 1-5,9-11 * column 2, line 26 - line 64; table A * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 5 * [X] 12;
 [AX]FR2654303  (VASSEUR JEAN) [A] 1,3,5-7,9-11 * the whole document * [X] 12;
 [AX]US5609123  (LUKE DONALD A ET AL) [A] 1,3,5,7,9-11 * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 3 * * column 8, line 47 - line 49 * [X] 12;
 [A]FR2628289  (COMPTOIR CENTRAL MEUNERIES AGR) [A] 1,5-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2460710  (BASSET FRANCOIS) [A] 1,7,8 * page 5, line 19 - line 36 *;
 [A]US5154594  (GAMLEN MEREDITH L) [A] 1,7 * column W *;
 [A]FR2658077  (COHAS PATRICE;COHAS PASCAL) [A] 7 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.