Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971060

EP0971060 - Method for making pile loops on a web by knitting, pile loop fabric made according to his method, and its application [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.08.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aplix
19, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Desgrand, Bernard
La Condamine
07340 Peaugres / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Eidelsberg, Victor Albert
Cabinet Flechner
22, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/02]Eidelsberg, Victor Albert
22 avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/02]Eidelsberg, Victor Albert
20, rue Vignon
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401676.405.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateFR1998000873908.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808739
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971060
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0971060
Date:08.10.2003
Language:FR
[2003/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:D04B23/08
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polschlingen auf einer Warenbahn, nach diesem Verfahren hergestellte Polschlingenware und deren Anwendung[2000/02]
English:Method for making pile loops on a web by knitting, pile loop fabric made according to his method, and its application[2000/02]
French:Procédé de formation par tricotage de boucles sur une feuille, tissu à boucles réalisé selon ce procédé, et son utilisation[2000/02]
Examination procedure14.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
19.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2003Fee for grant paid
01.08.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1267372  (VEB NÄHWIRKMASCHINENBAU MALIMO KARL.MARX-STADT) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 24; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]DE1585449  (VEB NÄHWIRKMASCHINENBAU MALIMO KARL-MARX-STADT) [A] 5,6 * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 4; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH0833509  ;
 [A]FR2169634  (VEB WIRKMASCHINENBAU KARL-MARX-STADT);
 [DA]US4003222  (WUNNER);
 [DA]EP0511580  (LIBA MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19660628), vol. 199, no. 606, & JP08033509 A 19960206 (MAKIHARA HIROKO) [A] 9 * abstract *