Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972694

EP0972694 - Electrically operated clamping device for adjusting the position of an element with respect to another [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.07.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEMFÖRDER NACAM SA
Route de Blois
41100 Vendôme / FR
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Ben Rhouma, M.Abdel Karim
13, rue Saulnerie
41100 Vendome / FR
02 / Robin, Thomas
Lieu-dit "Gorgeat"
41100 Aze / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Ramey, Daniel
Cabinet MARTINET & LAPOUX
43 boulevard Vauban
B.P. 405 GUYANCOURT
78055 SAINT QUENTIN YVELINES CEDEX / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Ramey, Daniel
Cabinet MARTINET & LAPOUX 43 boulevard Vauban B.P. 405 GUYANCOURT
78055 SAINT QUENTIN YVELINES CEDEX / FR
Application number, filing date99401681.405.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateFR1998000902313.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809023
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972694
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972694
Date:25.08.2004
Language:FR
[2004/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B62D1/18
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrisch betriebene Klemmvorrichtrung zum Verstellen der Position eines Teiles bezüglich eines anderen Teiles[2000/03]
English:Electrically operated clamping device for adjusting the position of an element with respect to another[2000/03]
French:Dispositif de serrage à commande électrique pour un système de réglage en position d'un élément par rapport à un autre élément[2000/03]
Examination procedure19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/12]
26.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2004Fee for grant paid
23.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.08.2004
ES06.12.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2005/23]ES06.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2687628  (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1-25 * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 18; figure 3 *;
 [A]US4541298  (STRUTT DEREK W [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-7 *;
 [A]FR2690403  (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4016163  (REICHE & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3409987  (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *