Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0976487

EP0976487 - Device for excimer laser machining of holes or forms with variable shapes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/05]Process for excimer laser machining of holes or forms with variable shapes
[2003/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.06.2004  [2004/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SNECMA MOTEURS
2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Snecma Moteurs
2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A."
2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Fournier, Gérard Albert Félix
5, rue Montperret
77930 Fleury en Biere / FR
02 / Vigneau, Joel Olivier Alfred Abel
10, rue de la Justice
91750 Champcueil / FR
[2000/05]
Application number, filing date99401709.308.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateFR1998000974230.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809742
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976487
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976487
Date:18.06.2003
Language:FR
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/06, B23K26/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung von Löchern oder von Formen mit veränderlichem Profil mittels eines Excimerlasers[2003/04]
English:Device for excimer laser machining of holes or forms with variable shapes[2003/04]
French:Dispositif d'usinage par laser excimère de trous ou de formes à profil variable[2003/04]
Former [2000/05]Verfahren zur Bearbeitung von Löchern oder von Formen mit veränderlichem Profil mittels eines Excimerlasers
Former [2000/05]Process for excimer laser machining of holes or forms with variable shapes
Former [2000/05]Procédé d'usinage par laser excimère de trous ou de formes à profil variable
Examination procedure20.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
15.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2003Fee for grant paid
07.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0729827  (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,9 * the whole document * [A] 7;
 [A]WO9315911  (XAAR LTD [GB]) [A] 1,9 * page 10, line 1 - line 6 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 25, paragraph 3; figures 1,3,5-13 *;
 [X]US5237148  (AOKI HIKOHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5739502  (ANDERSON THOMAS EDWIN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9;
 [AD]FR2637524  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [AD] 1,9 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2637524