Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972518

EP0972518 - Exchange of T lymphocytes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/03]EXCHANGE OF T LYMPHOCYTES
[2004/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université Pierre et Marie Curie (Paris 6)
4, Place Jussieu
75252 Paris Cedex 05 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
UNIVERSITE PIERRE ET MARIE CURIE PARIS VI
4, place Jussieu
75252 Paris Cédex 05 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Klatzmann, David
11 rue du Tage
75013 Paris / FR
02 / Cohen, José
53 rue Piat
75020 Paris / FR
03 / Boyer, Olivier
100 bis rue Ordener
75018 Paris / FR
04 / Thomas-Vaslin, Véronique
9 Sentier Martray
94320 Thiais / FR
05 / Salzmann, Jean-Loup
70 rue Calude Bernard
75005 Paris / FR
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Becker, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés
25 rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Becker, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis Le Grand
75002 Paris / FR
Former [2002/24]Becker, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés 35, rue des Mathurins
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/03]Becker, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Becker & Associés 10, rue de Milan
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401724.208.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateFR1998000895210.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9808952
[2000/03]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0972518
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0972518
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972518
Date:24.11.2004
Language:FR
[2004/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/14, C12N5/10, A61K39/395, // (A61K39/395, 35:14)
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesAL25.01.2000
LT25.01.2000
LV25.01.2000
MK25.01.2000
RO25.01.2000
SI25.01.2000
TitleGerman:Austausch von T-Lymphozyten[2004/15]
English:Exchange of T lymphocytes[2004/16]
French:Echange de lymphocytes T[2000/03]
Former [2000/03]AUSTAUCH VON T-LYPHOZYTEN
Former [2000/03]EXCHANGE OF T LYMPHOCYTES
Examination procedure25.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/13]
26.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
11.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2004Fee for grant paid
08.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46]
Request for further processing for:09.09.2003Request for further processing filed
09.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.09.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
03.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2003
31.07.200305   M06   Fee paid on   03.01.2004
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
IT24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
SE24.02.2005
PT24.04.2005
CY08.07.2005
LU08.07.2005
BE31.07.2005
CH31.07.2005
LI31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/26]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
SE24.02.2005
CY08.07.2005
LU08.07.2005
BE31.07.2005
CH31.07.2005
LI31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2007/21]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
SE24.02.2005
CY08.07.2005
BE31.07.2005
CH31.07.2005
LI31.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2006/36]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
BE31.07.2005
CH31.07.2005
LI31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2006/33]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
CH31.07.2005
LI31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2006/28]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
MC31.07.2005
Former [2006/14]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
IE24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/26]FI24.11.2004
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/24]FI24.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9745142  (GENETIC THERAPY INC [US]) [X] 1,17,18 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - CONTASSOT E ET AL, "In vivo alloreactive potential of ex vivo-expanded primary T lymphocytes.", TRANSPLANTATION, (1998 MAY 27) 65 (10) 1365-70, XP002100637 [X] 1,17,18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-199805270-00014
 [X]  - TIBERGHIEN, PIERRE, "Use of donor T - lymphocytes expressing herpes-simplex thymidine kinase in allogeneic bone marrow transplantation: a phase I-II study", HUM. GENE THER. (1997), 8(5), 615-624, XP002100638 [X] 1,17,18 * the whole document *
 [X]  - COHEN J L ET AL, "Prevention of graft-versus-host disease in mice using a suicide gene expressed in T lymphocytes.", BLOOD, (1997 JUN 15) 89 (12) 4636-45., XP002123704 [X] 1,17-22 * the whole document *
 [X]  - GEORGES G E ET AL, "CANINE CTL TRANSDUCED WITH HS-THYMIDINE KINASE GENE MAINTAIN CYTOTOXIC ACTIVITY AND ARE ELIMINATED BY GANCICLOVIR: A MODEL TO ENHANCE ENGRAFTMENT, CONTROL GVHD AND DECREASE PREPARATIVE REGIMEN INTENSITY IN ALLOGENEIC BLOOD STEM CELL TRANSPLANTATION", BLOOD,US,PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 88, no. 10, SUPPL. 01, ISSN 0006-4971, page 245A, XP000670304 [X] 1-6,17-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TIBERGHIEN P, "[Modulation of alloreactivity using genetically modified T lymphocytes ]. Modulation de l'alloreactivite par l'utilisation de lymphocytes T genetiquement modifies.", TRANSFUSION CLINIQUE ET BIOLOGIQUE, (1997) 4 (3) 275-80, XP002100639 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1246-7820(97)80052-3
 [A]  - HELENE M ET AL, "Inhibition of graft-versus-host disease. Use of a T cell-controlled suicide gene.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1997 JUN 1) 158 (11) 5079-82, XP002100640 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BORDIGNON C ET AL, "Transfer of the HSV-tk gene into donor peripheral blood lymphocytes for in vivo modulation of donor anti-tumor immunity after allogeneic bone marrow transplantation.", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995 JUN) 6 (6) 813-9, XP002100641 [A] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - GEORGES G E ET AL, "Canine T cells transduced with a herpes simplex virus thymidine kinase gene: a model to study effects on engraftment and control of graft-versus-host disease.", TRANSPLANTATION, (1998 AUG 27) 66 (4) 540-4, XP000857093 [PX] 1-6,17-22 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007890-199808270-00023
 [PX]  - TIBERGHIEN P, ""Suicide" gene for the control of graft-versus-host disease.", CURRENT OPINION IN HEMATOLOGY, (1998 NOV) 5 (6) 478-82, XP000857091 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO9605287