Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971464

EP0971464 - Optical pulse generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ANDO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
19-7, Kamata 4-chome Ota-ku
Tokyo 144 / JP
For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
ANDO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
19-7, Kamata 4-chome Ota-ku
Tokyo 144 / JP
For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kumagai, Yoshihiro
c/o Ando El. Co.,Ltd 19-7,kamata 4-chome,Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Ichikawa, Akio
c/o Ando El. Co.,Ltd 19-7,kamata 4-chome,Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Iida, Rikihiro
c/o Ando El. Co.,Ltd 19-7,kamata 4-chome,Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Nakazawa, Masataka c/o Nippon Telegr. & Tel. Corp.
20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku, 3-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Yoshida, Eiji c/o Nippon Telegr. & Tel. Corp.
20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku, 3-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Poulin, Gérard , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/02]Poulin, Gérard , et al
Société BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401730.909.07.1999
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateJP1998019637410.07.1998         Original published format: JP 19637498
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971464
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0971464
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/083, H01S3/098, H04B10/155
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optischer Impulsgeber[2000/02]
English:Optical pulse generator[2000/02]
French:Générateur d'impulsions optiques[2000/02]
Examination procedure01.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/05]
12.03.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
06.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
22.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.04.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH0818139  ;
 [A]GB2262836  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, [DA] 1 * abstract *