Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980899

EP0980899 - Multilayer coating film [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Paint Co., Ltd.
1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 531 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD.
1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 531 / JP
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Nippon Paint Co., Ltd.
1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 531 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakamoto, Hiroyuki
5-11-501-608 Koyochonaka, Higashinada-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0032 / JP
02 / Kawakami, Ichiro
1-10-5-109 Kamihamuro
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1044 / JP
03 / Saito, Takao
2-17-9 Midorigaoka
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 569-0002 / JP
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date99401829.920.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateJP1998020652122.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20652198
JP1998037249028.12.1998         Original published format: JP 37249098
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980899
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980899
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980899
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/44, C25D13/06
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:Mehrschichtiger Beschichtungsfilm[2003/37]
English:Multilayer coating film[2000/08]
French:Composition de revêtement à plusieurs couches[2000/08]
Former [2000/08]Mehrschichtiges Überzugsmittel
Examination procedure31.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
20.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2003Fee for grant paid
18.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
CY17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
FR17.09.2003
IT17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
DE18.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
CY17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
FR17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
DE18.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
Former [2006/14]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
FR17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
DE18.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
Former [2004/46]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
DE18.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
ES28.12.2003
Former [2004/44]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
DE18.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/41]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
DK17.12.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/31]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
PT26.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT17.09.2003
BE17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/22]AT17.09.2003
CH17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
LI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
SE17.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT17.09.2003
FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
GR17.12.2003
Former [2004/13]FI17.09.2003
NL17.09.2003
Former [2004/12]FI17.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0080122  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, XP002900745 [X] 1-5