Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1070665

EP1070665 - Gyroscopic actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astrium SAS
37, avenue Louis Bréguet
78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR
[2001/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Blais, Thierry
10, rue du Breil
31320 Vigoulet / FR
 [2001/04]
Representative(s)Fort, Jacques
CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[2001/04]
Application number, filing date99401844.821.07.1999
[2001/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1070665
Date:24.01.2001
Language:FR
[2001/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B64G1/28, G01C19/06, G01C19/08, G05D1/08
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesDE [2001/41]
Former [2001/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gyroskopischer Stellantrieb[2001/04]
English:Gyroscopic actuator[2001/04]
French:Actionneur gyroscopique[2001/04]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
25.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.11.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
01.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
12.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.09.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.09.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]FR2773775  (MATRA MARCONI SPACE FRANCE [FR]) [E] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [XAY]US5256942  (WOOD ROSS C [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 9 - line 66 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 33 * * figure 1 * [A] 7,8 [Y] 2-6;
 [Y]US3603161  (SCHWARZ KARLHANS) [Y] 2-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2384174  (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 2,3 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 23 * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 6 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5 * * figure 1 *