blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0976946

EP0976946 - Electromagnetic motor and active vibration control device incorporating such a motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUTCHINSON
2, rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
[2004/38]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
HUTCHINSON
2 rue Balzac
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pompei, Michel
38, rue Pierre Semard
91700 Villiers-sur-Orge / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Doireau, Marc, et al
Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Doireau, Marc, et al
Cabinet Orès 6, avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401851.322.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateFR1998000976030.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809760
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0976946
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0976946
Date:15.09.2004
Language:FR
[2004/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16F7/10, F16F15/03, H02K33/12, B60K5/12
[2000/05]
CPC:
F16F15/03 (EP,US); B60K5/1283 (EP,US); H02K33/12 (EP,US);
H02K2201/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:Elektromagnet-Motor und aktive Schwingungsvorrichtung unter Verwendung eines solchen Motors[2000/05]
English:Electromagnetic motor and active vibration control device incorporating such a motor[2000/05]
French:Moteur électromagnétique et dispositif de controle actif des vibrations comportant au moins un tel moteur.[2000/05]
Examination procedure26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
29.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2004Fee for grant paid
21.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR15.12.2004
PT15.02.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2005/18]GR15.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0985168  ;
 [A]US4793599  (ISHIOKA YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1,4,7,9 * column A * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 43 * * column 10, line 4 - column 11, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4874998  (HOLLIS JR RALPH L [US]) [A] 1,4-6 * column A * * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 5 ** column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 31; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4947067  (HABERMANN HELMUT [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,9 * column A * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 40; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9201876  (ACTIVE NOISE & VIBRATION TECH [US]) [A] 1,4,7,9 * abstract * * page 9, line 13 - page 13, line 5; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5091710  (OHBA SOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * column A * * column 8, line 29 - column 10, line 19; figures 4,5A,5B *;
 [A]EP0509911  (MECANIQUE MAGNETIQUE SA [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 47 - column 7, line 10; figures 1-4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 97, no. 7, & JP09085168 A 19970331 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.