Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0977148

EP0977148 - Electronic apparatus for image registration [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INRIA - Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique
Domaine de Voluceau
Rocquencourt
B.P. 105
78153 Le Chesnay Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
INRIA INSTITUT NATIONAL DE RECHERCHE EN INFORMATIQUE ET EN AUTOMATIQUE
Domaine de Voluceau, B.P. 105
Rocquencourt F-78153 Le Chesnay / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Roche, Alexis
1528, Chemin de la Font des Fades
06560 Valbonne / FR
02 / Ayache, Nicholas
16, avenue Ratti
06000 Nice / FR
03 / Malandain, Grégoire
12 ter, avenue Pasteur
06600 Antibes / FR
04 / Pennec, Xavier
481, route de Nice, Les Magnolias
06600 Antibes / FR
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Plaçais, Jean Yves , et al
Cabinet Netter
36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Plaçais, Jean-Yves , et al
Cabinet Netter, 40, rue Vignon
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401881.023.07.1999
[2000/05]
Priority number, dateFR1998000964928.07.1998         Original published format: FR 9809649
[2000/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0977148
Date:02.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0977148
Date:18.08.2004
Language:FR
[2004/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06T3/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/42]
Former [2000/05]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtung zur Bildausrichtung[2000/05]
English:Electronic apparatus for image registration[2000/05]
French:Dispositif électronique de recalage automatique d'images[2000/05]
Examination procedure04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
10.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2004Fee for grant paid
08.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200103   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES29.11.2004
[2005/23]
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9741532  (US HEALTH [US]) [Y] 1-17 * page 3, line 6 - line 8 * * page 7, line 10 - line 30 *;
 [Y]GB1437161  (CONTROL DATA CORP) [Y] 1-17 * page 15, line 41 - line 44; claims 2,9 *;
 [X]  BUZUG T M ET AL, "Voxel-based similarity measures for medical image registration in radiological diagnosis and image guided surgery", JOURNAL OF COMPUTING AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - CIT, JUNE 1998, UNIV. COMPUT. CENTRE, ZAGREB, CROATIA, ISSN 1330-1136, vol. 6, no. 2, pages 165 - 179, XP002099326 [X] 1-17 * page 165, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 170, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 171, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 172, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  MORT M S ET AL, "Maximum likelihood image registration with subpixel accuracy", APPLICATIONS OF DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING XI, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 15-17 AUG. 1988, ISSN 0277-786X, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1988, USA, vol. 974, pages 38 - 45, XP002099327 [A] 4 * abstract * * page 43, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  VAN DEN ELSEN P A ET AL, "AUTOMATIC REGISTRATION OF CT AND MR BRAIN IMAGES USING CORRELATION OF GEOMETRICAL FEATURES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, (199506), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 384 - 396, XP000520949 [A] 1-17 * page 384, column R, paragraph 4 - page 385, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 386, column R, paragraph 4 - page 387, column L, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.387719
 [A]  HERBIN M ET AL, "AUTOMATED REGISTRATION OF DISSIMILAR IMAGES: APPLICATION TO MEDICALIMAGERY", COMPUTER VISION GRAPHICS AND IMAGE PROCESSING, (19890701), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 77 - 88, XP000086844 [A] 1-17 * page 77, paragraph 1 - page 78, paragraph 1 * * page 82, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0734-189X(89)90055-8
 [A]  WOODS R P ET AL, "MRI-PET REGISTRATION WITH AUTOMATED ALGORITHM", JOURNAL OF COMPUTER ASSISTED TOMOGRAPHY, (199307), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 536 - 546, XP000613886
 [A]  VIOLA P ET AL, "ALIGNMENT BY MAXIMIZATION OF MUTUAL INFORMATION", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (199709), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 137 - 154, XP000703579

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007958904918
 [A]  MAES F ET AL, "MULTIMODALITY IMAGE REGISTRATION BY MAXIMIZATION OF MUTUAL INFORMATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, (199704), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 187 - 198, XP000685807

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.563664