Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993826

EP0993826 - Use of a Sanguisorba officinalis extract to stimulate the skin- and/or the hair-pigmentation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]Use of a sanguisorba officinalis extract to stimulate the skin- and/or the hair-pigmentation
[2000/51]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pelletier, Pascale
50, rue de Reims
92160 Antony / FR
02 / Regnier, Marcelle
234, rue Championnet
75018 Paris / FR
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Renard, Emmanuelle
L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Renard, Emmanuelle
L'OREAL/DPI 6, Rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99401905.726.07.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateFR1998001115407.09.1998         Original published format: FR 9811154
[2000/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993826
Date:19.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993826
Date:04.07.2001
Language:FR
[2001/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/48, A61K7/06, A61K7/42
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Sanguisorba officinalis Extrakten zur Förderung der Haut- und/oder Haar-Pigmentierung[2001/11]
English:Use of a Sanguisorba officinalis extract to stimulate the skin- and/or the hair-pigmentation[2000/51]
French:Utilisation d' un extrait de Sanguisorba officinalis pour favoriser la pigmentation de la peau et/ou des cheveux[2000/51]
Former [2000/16]Verwendung von einem sanguisorba officinalis extrakten zur haut- und/oder haar-pigmentierung förderung
Former [2000/16]Use of a sanguisorba officinalis extract to stimulate the skin- and/or the hair-pigmentation
Former [2000/16]Utilisation d' un extrait de sanguisorba officinalis pour favoriser la pigmentation de la peau et/ou des cheveux
Examination procedure28.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
28.08.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
28.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.04.2001Fee for grant paid
25.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.07.2001
CY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
NL04.07.2001
LU26.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
DK04.10.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
GR05.10.2001
MC01.02.2002
[2006/39]
Former [2005/01]AT04.07.2001
CY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
NL04.07.2001
LU26.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
DK04.10.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
GR05.10.2001
Former [2004/39]AT04.07.2001
CY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
NL04.07.2001
LU26.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
DK04.10.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2004/05]AT04.07.2001
CY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
NL04.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
DK04.10.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2003/46]AT04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
NL04.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
DK04.10.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2003/06]AT04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
NL04.07.2001
BE31.07.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/48]AT04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/27]AT04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/15]AT04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/05]SE04.10.2001
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0375082  (KANEBO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0727217  (SUNTORY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [AD]JPS63303910
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 013, no. 137, Database accession no. (C - 582), [AD] 1-8 * abstract *