Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978371

EP0978371 - Method of reinforcing the load carrying sidewalls of trays of corrugated cardboard and tray so obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMURFIT-SOCAR
5, Avenue du Général de Gaulle
F-94160 Saint-Mandé / FR
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Dixneuf, Claude
38,rue des petits Chatelets
94370 SUCY EN BRIE / FR
02 / Meurant, Alain
14, rue des forestiers
94440 Marolles-en-Brie / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Jolly, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Jolly, Jean-Pierre , et al
Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99401918.027.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateFR1998001012206.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810122
[2000/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978371
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978371
Date:20.11.2002
Language:FR
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B31B15/00, B65D21/02, B31B1/25
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verstärkung der tragenden Seitenwand einer Steige aus Wellpappe sowie nach dem Verfahren hergestellter Artikel[2000/06]
English:Method of reinforcing the load carrying sidewalls of trays of corrugated cardboard and tray so obtained[2000/06]
French:Procédé de renforcement de parois porteuses d'un conditionnement en carton ondulé et conditionnement obtenu par ce procédé[2000/06]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
10.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
06.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2002Fee for grant paid
23.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
26.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
26.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB492974  (THOMPSON & NORRIS MFG COMPANY, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, paragraph L; figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]EP0444004  (SCA PACKAGING BELGIUM N V [BE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 5,6 *