Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980198

EP0980198 - Detachable tool for making electrically conductive bumps on electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BULL S.A.
68, route de Versailles
78430 Louveciennes / FR
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Petit, Claude
17, rue de Chevreuse
91140 Villebon sur Yvette / FR
02 / Saint-Martin, Xavier
5, résidence les Fougères
78340 Les Clayes / FR
[2000/07]
Application number, filing date99401995.805.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateFR1998001040313.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810403
[2000/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980198
Date:16.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/34, H01L21/48
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Abnehmbares Werkzeug zur Herstellung von elektrisch leitfähigen Höckern auf elektronischen Bauelementen[2000/07]
English:Detachable tool for making electrically conductive bumps on electronic components[2000/07]
French:Outillage amovible pour la réalisation de bossages, conducteurs électriques, sur des composants électroniques[2000/07]
Examination procedure16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
19.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/41]
08.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5431332  (KIRBY THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 5 - line 8; figure 8 *;
 [A]US5685477  (MALLIK DEBENDRA [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5-7 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 37; figures 7-9 *;
 [A]JPH10209623  ;
 [A]JPH0818210
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 98, no. 13, & JP10209623 A 19980807 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) [A] 1,2,5-7 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 96, no. 5, & JP08018210 A 19960119 (FUJITSU) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract *