Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981142

EP0981142 - Apparatus for winding [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/08]Method and apparatus for winding
[2001/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alstom France SA
38 avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Bernaudat, Marc
36, rue des Sources
90 350 Evette-Salbert / FR
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Gosse, Michel , et al
ALSTOM Technologies
C.I.P.D.
23/25 Avenue Morane-Saulnier
92360 Meudon La Foret / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Gosse, Michel , et al
ALSTOM Technologies C.I.P.D. 23/25 Avenue Morane-Saulnier
92360 Meudon La Foret / FR
Former [2000/08]Gosse, Michel , et al
ALSTOM Technology - C.I.P.D. 5, Avenue Newton
92142 Clamart Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date99402026.110.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateFR1998001052814.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810528
[2000/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981142
Date:23.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981142
Date:13.02.2002
Language:FR
[2002/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01F41/06
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Wickeln[2001/29]
English:Apparatus for winding[2001/29]
French:Dispositif de bobinage[2001/29]
Former [2000/08]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wickeln
Former [2000/08]Method and apparatus for winding
Former [2000/08]Procédé et dispositif de bobinage
Examination procedure03.07.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
23.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
22.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2001Fee for grant paid
26.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB13.02.2002
IT13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
[2008/17]
Former [2003/09]GB13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
Former [2003/01]GB13.02.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0674328  (UNIV RES ASS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5461773  (KAWAGUCHI TAKEO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 11 - line 41; figure 15 *
ExaminationUS4884759
 EP0470315