Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0997190

EP0997190 - Ellipsoidal adsorbent particles and use thereof in a method for producing gas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2006Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.10.2006  [2006/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]For all designated states
L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Labasque, Jacques
67, rue Jean de la Fontaine
78000 Versailles / FR
02 / Moreau, Serge
22, rue du Général Exelmans
78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Pittis, Olivier , et al
L'Air Liquide, S.A.
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/19]Pittis, Olivier , et al
L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2000/18]Le Moenner, Gabriel , et al
L'Air Liquide S.A., DSPI, Service Brevets et Marques, 75 Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date99402229.110.09.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateFR1998001185723.09.1998         Original published format: FR 9811857
[2000/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0997190
Date:03.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01J20/28, B01D53/047, B01J20/18
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2001/03]
Former [2000/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ellipsoidische Adsorbens-Partikel und deren Verwendung in einem Verfahren zur Gaserzeugung[2000/18]
English:Ellipsoidal adsorbent particles and use thereof in a method for producing gas[2000/18]
French:Particules d'adsorbant ellipsoidales et leur utilisation dans un procédé de production de gaz[2000/18]
Examination procedure03.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
23.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
01.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2006Date of oral proceedings
29.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/42]
29.05.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.06.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9717132  (PHARMACIA BIOTECH AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 25; claims 9,10 *;
 [A]EP0785020  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 8,9,13 * page 5, column 8, line 15 - page 7, column 11, line 57 *;
 [A]EP0855209  (CECA SA [FR]) [A] 8-11 * page 1, lines 1-19 * * page 3, lines 7-39 *;
 [A]EP0827771  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 8,9,12 * pages 12-14; claims 1-19 *;
 [A]JPH06170232
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940922), vol. 018, no. 506, Database accession no. (C - 1252), [A] 1 * abstract *