EP0987097 - Mopheads for washing and drying [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINANCIERE ELYSEES BALZAC 2, Rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | [2000/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chalvin, Christophe 1, rue Jacques de Guéhengnies 60000 Beauvais / FR | 02 /
Crux, Christine 7, rue Pierre Sauvage 60200 Compiègne / FR | 03 /
Johnson, Bryan 29, rue de Calais 60000 Beauvais / FR | 04 /
Veillerobe, Philippe 7, Chemin Vert 60650 Saint Paul / FR | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402257.2 | 15.09.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | FR19980011543 | 16.09.1998 Original published format: FR 9811543 | [2000/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987097 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987097 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/18, A47L13/16 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
A47L13/16 (EP);
B32B5/245 (US);
A47L13/20 (EP);
B32B5/022 (US);
B32B5/026 (US);
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/32 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2307/728 (US);
| Designated contracting states | ES, PT [2000/49] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mopkörper zum Waschen und Trocknen | [2000/12] | English: | Mopheads for washing and drying | [2000/12] | French: | Têtes de balai à franges lavantes et asséchantes | [2000/12] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 23.09.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 24.04.2005 | [2008/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4341832 (BARNETT GARY A, et al) [A] 1,7-9,11 * column 2, line 35 - line 43 * * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 12 *; | [DA]EP0335050 (SPONTEX SA [FR]) [DA] 1,2,7-11 * page 2, line 1 - line 53 *; | [A]FR2680670 (ELYSEES BALZAC FINANCIERE [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5217787 (MONAHAN PATRICK H [US]) [A] 1* the whole document * |