Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993110

EP0993110 - Amplifier device with digitally controllable gain and optical disc read apparatus incorporating such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON multimedia
46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Dautriche, Pierre
THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonso Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Kohrs, Martin , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [N/P]Kohrs, Martin , et al
Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR
Former [2000/15]Kohrs, Martin , et al
Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Application number, filing date99402282.017.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateFR1998001249506.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812495
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993110
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993110
Date:10.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03G1/00, G11B7/09, G11B7/00
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verstärkervorrichtung mit digital steuerbarer Verstärkung und Lesegerät für optische Platten mit einer solchen Vorrichtung[2000/15]
English:Amplifier device with digitally controllable gain and optical disc read apparatus incorporating such a device[2000/15]
French:Dispositif amplificateur à commande numérique de gain et dispositif de lecture de disque optique comportant un tel dispositif[2000/15]
Examination procedure18.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
08.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2006Fee for grant paid
14.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Request for further processing for:04.05.2005Request for further processing filed
04.05.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.05.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
10.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US4250461  (LIMBERG ALLEN L [US]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 21 - column 8, line 9; figure 17 *;
 [A]US4064506  (CARTWRIGHT JR JAMES MURGEN) [A] 1 * column 2, line 27 - line 65; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4439673  (GONTOWSKI JR WALTER S [US]) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]US4485301  (GONTOWSKI JR WALTER S [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * column A *;
 [A]EP0577265  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column A *;
 [A]US3940760  (BROKAW ADRIAN PAUL) [A] 1 * column A *