EP0988818 - Centrifugation accessory for kitchen robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | ||
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Moulinex S.A. 2 Rue de l'Industrie 14123 Cormelles Le Royal / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morin, Gilles 3 Allée du Moulin 14930 Vieux / FR | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SAS Groupe SEB Moulinex Département Propriété Industrielle 8 rue du Colonel Rémy 14054 Caen Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Kiehl, Hubert, et al SAS Groupe SEB Moulinex Département Propriété Industrielle 8 rue du Colonel Rémy 14052 Caen Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/13] | Busquets, Jean-Pierre Moulinex S.A., 8, Rue du Colonel Rémy 14052 Caen / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402305.9 | 21.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | FR19980011780 | 21.09.1998 Original published format: FR 9811780 | [2000/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0988818 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0988818 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47J19/02, A47J43/25 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
A47J19/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [2001/14] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zentrifugationszubehör für eine elektrische Küchenmaschine | [2000/13] | English: | Centrifugation accessory for kitchen robot | [2000/13] | French: | Accessoire de centrifugation pour appareil ménager de préparation culinaire | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 07.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/39] | 23.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3639804 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-7 * column 3, line 1 - line 20 * * column 3, line 30 - line 37 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]CH377495 (JURA ELEKTROAPPARATE FAB [CH]) [A] 1,3,5-7 * column 1, line 16 - line 25 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 93 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4506601 (RAMIREZ JUSTO F [MX], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * column 4, line 25 - line 56 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5784954 (KOKOT EUGENIUSZ [PL], et al) [A] 3 * column 5, line 8 - line 29 * * figure 3 * |