EP0993216 - ATM switch matrix having a passive optical core [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vinel, Paul 50 rue de Villacoublay 78140 Velizy / FR | 02 /
Parmentier, Pierre 9 rue Montesquieu 91400 Saclay / FR | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Sciaux, Edmond COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propr. Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402325.7 | 23.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | FR19980012610 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812610 | [2000/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993216 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993216 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04L12/56 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L49/1576 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5605 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0066 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | ATM Schaltmatrix mit einem passiven optischen Kern | [2000/15] | English: | ATM switch matrix having a passive optical core | [2000/15] | French: | Matrice de commutation ATM comportant un noyau optique passif | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 15.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2006 | CY | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | IE | 15.11.2006 | NL | 15.11.2006 | DK | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | GR | 16.02.2007 | ES | 26.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
GR | 16.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
IE | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
ES | 26.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
NL | 15.11.2006 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5303078 (BRACKETT CHARLES A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, lines 4-22 *; | [A] - DUAN G -H ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF ATM WAVELENGTH ROUTING SYSTEMS BY EXPLORING THEIR SIMILITUDE WITH SPACE DIVISION SWITCHING", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), CONVERGING TECHNOLOGIES FOR TOMORROW'S APPLICATIONS DALLAS, JUNE 23 - 27, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL & ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960623), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-3251-2, pages 1783 - 1787, XP000625113 [A] 1 * figure 1 * |