EP0991055 - Magnetic head device and disc drive device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanai, Fujio c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Koji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Saito, Hitoshi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Soda, Yutaka c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402396.8 | 30.09.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | JP19980278988 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27898898 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991055 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/48 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G11B5/4813 (EP,US);
G11B21/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/51] |
Former [2000/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetkopfvorrichtung und Plattenlaufwerk | [2000/14] | English: | Magnetic head device and disc drive device | [2000/14] | French: | Dispositif à tête magnétique et lecteur de disque | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 06.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH1166782 ; | [X]EP0342625 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,11,16,17 * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 4; figures 1-3B *; | [X]US5519552 (KOHIRA HIDEKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,11,16 * column 4, line 26 - line 58; figure 1 *; | [X]US5771136 (GIRARD MARK T [US]) [X] 1,2,11,13 * column 4, line 30 - line 40; figure 1 * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11066782 A 19990309 (TDK CORP) [XP] 1,5,11,16 * abstract * |