Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993868

EP0993868 - Ex-situ presulfiding in the presence of a hydrocarbon [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.01.2017  [2017/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EURECAT SA.
Quai Jean Jaurès B.P. 45
07800 La Voulte-sur-Rhône / FR
[2016/05]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
EURECAT SA.
Quai Jean Jaurès B.P. 45
07800 La Voulte-sur-Rhône / FR
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
EURECAT EUROPEENNE DE RETRAITEMENT DE CATALYSEURS
Quai Jean Jaurès B.P. 45
F-07800 La Voulte-sur-Rhône / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Dufresne, Pierre
26, rue Florian
26000 Valance / FR
02 / Labruyere, Franck
Le Village
07800 St.Georges Les Bains / FR
[2000/21]
Former [2000/16]01 / Dufresne, Pierre
26, rue Florian
26000 Valance / FR
02 / Labruyere, Franck
24, rue Roger Brechan
69003 Lyon / FR
Representative(s)Schmitt, Nicolas A.J. , et al
IFP Energies nouvelles
Département Propriété Industrielle
1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/05]Schmitt, Nicolas A.J. , et al
IFP Energies nouvelles
1 et 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
Former [2008/20]Schmitt, Nicolas A.J. , et al
Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR
Former [2003/01]Benoist, François , et al
Institut Français du Pétrole 1 et 4, avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Former [2000/16]Andréeff, François , et al
Département Brevets, Institut Français du Petrole, 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92852 Rueil Malmaison / FR
Application number, filing date99402400.830.09.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateFR1998001273912.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812739
[2000/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993868
Date:19.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993868
Date:03.02.2016
Language:FR
[2016/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B01J23/85, B01J23/882, B01J23/883, B01J23/888, B01J37/20, B01J37/02
[2015/31]
Former International [2000/16]B01J37/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   LU [2016/05]
Former [2001/01]DE,  FR,  IT,  LU 
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ex-Situ Vorschwefelung in Gegenwart eines Kohlenwasserstoffes[2000/16]
English:Ex-situ presulfiding in the presence of a hydrocarbon[2000/16]
French:Présulfuration hors site en présence de molécule hydrocarbonée[2000/16]
Examination procedure19.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/50]
22.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2015Fee for grant paid
03.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2003
Opposition(s)04.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 16
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 17
Documents cited:Search[DXA]EP0785022  (EURECAT EUROP RETRAIT CATALYS [FR]) [DX] 1-9 * page 5, line 53 - page 6, line 37; example 7 * * the whole document * [A] 1-9;
 [X]GB1324034  (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [X] 1-9 * claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0396206  (AKZO NV [NL]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 42; claims 1,3,4 *;
 [X]GB1553616  (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 19 *;
 [X]US5338717  (ALDRIDGE CLYDE L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * column 2, line 13 - line 64 * * column 5, line 29 - line 51; claims 1-3,6 *;
 [X]FR1359378  (CALIFORNIA RESEARCH CORP) [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 2, column 1 * * page 3, line 56 - line 58 *;
 [DA]EP0564317  (EURECAT EUROP RETRAIT CATALYS [FR]) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 4 - line 16 *