EP0994263 - Anti-theft protection device for a motor vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lefranc, Jean-Louis 23, rue du Pré Nicolas Roux 60119 Neuville Bosc / FR | 02 /
Jomin, Nicolas 52, Avenue Foch 77450 Esbly / FR | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel, et al Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Thinat, Michel, et al Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402407.3 | 01.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | FR19980012805 | 13.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812805 | [2000/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994263 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994263 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16B41/00, B60B3/16, E05B47/00 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B60B3/165 (EP);
F16B41/005 (EP);
E05B51/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | Antidiebstahlvorrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeugrad | [2000/16] | English: | Anti-theft protection device for a motor vehicle wheel | [2000/16] | French: | Dispositif de protection antivol pour une roue de véhicule automobile | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 14.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2003 | FI | 14.05.2003 | IE | 14.05.2003 | NL | 14.05.2003 | DK | 14.08.2003 | GR | 14.08.2003 | PT | 14.08.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | CY | 01.10.2003 | LU | 01.10.2003 | BE | 31.10.2003 | CH | 31.10.2003 | LI | 31.10.2003 | MC | 31.10.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 31.10.2003 | ||
LI | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
CY | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
DK | 14.08.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
IE | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
FI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 14.05.2003 | |
GR | 14.08.2003 | ||
PT | 14.08.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2034802 (HUSSLEIN P) [A] 1 * page 5; figure - *; | [Y]US4617448 (GOLDOWSKY MICHAEL P [US]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3520452 (DOM SICHERHEITSTECHNIK [DE]); | [A]FR2587422 (BLIMEX [FR]); | [A]EP0463744 (DOM SICHERHEITSTECHNIK [DE]); | [Y]DE29606408U (MCGARD DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - * |