blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995681 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995681



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 271
12.05.2010 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
12.05.2010 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
07.05.2010 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
13.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.02.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
04.02.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
28.01.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.01.2010 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
28.01.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 4
28.01.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.12.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2009 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
07.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.09.2009 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 5
30.04.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
30.04.2009 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
30.04.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.02.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
13.02.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 4
18.10.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
18.10.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
20.09.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
13.09.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 11
13.09.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
13.09.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
13.09.2007 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
12.09.2007 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 13
16.11.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.08.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.08.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.08.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.06.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.06.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.06.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
20.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
20.04.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
14.04.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.02.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.02.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.02.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.10.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2003 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.07.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.06.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.06.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
26.06.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.06.2001 Request for change of name Search / examination 9
07.04.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
15.10.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
15.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 16
01.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
01.10.1999 Description Search / examination 7
01.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
01.10.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
01.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6