blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995681
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0995681Global Dossier 13.12.2006B1
EP0995681 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9812471 06.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT348040T 15.01.2007T
Priority number Date
FR9812471 06.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69934375T 31.10.2007T2
DE69934375D 25.01.2007D1
Priority number Date
FR9812471 06.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2276511T 16.06.2007T3
Priority number Date
FR9812471 06.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2784075 17.11.2000B1
FR2784075 07.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9812471 06.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6463713 15.10.2002B1
Priority number Date
FR9812471 06.10.1998