Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995681

EP0995681 - Unit for manufacturing and packaging roll-shaped articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.05.2010
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2010Opposition rejectedpublished on 16.06.2010  [2010/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georgia-Pacific France
11, route Industrielle
68320 Kunheim / FR
[2001/32]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
FORT JAMES FRANCE
11, route Industrielle
68320 Kunheim / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Ruemeli, Robert
4, rue des Pâquerettes
68280 Sundhoffen / FR
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Cortier, Sophie
Georgia-Pacific France
Service Propriété Industrielle
23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/36]Cortier, Sophie
Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau
92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
Former [2000/17]David, Daniel
Fort James France Service Propriété Industrielle, 23 Boulevard Georges Clemenceau, B.P. 321
92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date99402411.501.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateFR1998001247106.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812471
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995681
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995681
Date:13.12.2006
Language:FR
[2006/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65B25/14, B65G47/64, B65G47/71
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:Anlage zum Herstellen und Verpacken von rollenförmigen Gegenständen[2006/25]
English:Unit for manufacturing and packaging roll-shaped articles[2000/17]
French:Unité de fabrication et d'emballage de produits en rouleaux[2000/17]
Former [2000/17]Anlage zum herstellen und verpacken von rollenförmigen gegenständen
Examination procedure26.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
13.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2006Fee for grant paid
26.10.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.09.2007   
Pulsar S.r.l.
Via Serenari 29
40013 Castel Maggiore (Bologna) / IT
Opponent's representative
Fanzini, Valeriano, et al
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2007/42]
Opponent(s)01  12.09.2007   
Pulsar S.r.l.
Via Serenari 29
40013 Castel Maggiore (Bologna) / IT
Opponent's representative
Fanzini, Valeriano, et al
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
18.10.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.02.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2009Reply to a communication from the opposition division
28.01.2010Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
08.02.2010Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.12.2006
CY13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
LU01.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/43]AT13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/35]AT13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/26]AT13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
MC31.10.2007
Former [2008/21]AT13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
GR14.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
Former [2008/17]AT13.12.2006
DK13.12.2006
IE13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
PT14.05.2007
Former [2007/30]AT13.12.2006
SE13.03.2007
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4705152  (LINKER FRANK V [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 22; figure -; claim - *;
 [DY]US4440289  (WEIS RUDOLF R [US]) [DY] 1-5 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 40; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0666230  (SAPAL PLIEUSES AUTOMATIQUES [CH]) [Y] 4 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0654407  (CASSOLI MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE C [IT]);
 [A]FR2738231  (FEGE FRANCOIS LOIC [FR])
by applicantUS4440289