blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993088 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993088



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 202
04.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
04.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 36
04.10.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
04.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
04.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
04.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.10.1999 Description Search / examination 25
04.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
04.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.09.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.11.2000 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
09.02.2001 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
16.11.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.03.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
24.03.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.03.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.04.2006 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
11.04.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
12.04.2006 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
26.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.04.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.06.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.08.2006 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
16.08.2006 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
16.08.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
04.09.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.06.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
27.06.2007 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.06.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
27.06.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
27.06.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 12
27.06.2007 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
19.10.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
19.10.2007 Claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
09.01.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
09.01.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.03.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
28.03.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
31.03.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.05.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.05.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.05.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.05.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
08.05.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.05.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
23.05.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.06.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.04.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1