blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993088


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.04.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.05.2009  [2009/22]
09.01.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2009  [2009/07]
20.06.2008 Change - divisional application(s) published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
06.06.2008 Change - representative published on  09.07.2008  [2008/28]
16.05.2008 (Expected) grant published on  18.06.2008  [2008/25]
09.04.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.04.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.12.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.10.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.10.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2007 First examination report
09.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.09.2006 Change - applicant published on  04.10.2006  [2006/40]
07.04.2006 Change - representative published on  24.05.2006  [2006/21]
24.03.2006 Change - representative published on  10.05.2006  [2006/19]
26.10.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.11.2002 Change - representative published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
29.10.2002 Renewal fee
30.10.2001 Renewal fee
22.05.2001 Loss of particular rights
07.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
11.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
09.11.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
29.09.2000 Request for examination filed published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]