blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993088 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP08158430 EP99402425



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1981136Global Dossier 09.06.2010A3
EP1981136 15.10.2008A2
Priority number Date
EP99402425 04.10.1999
FR9812558 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000156546Global Dossier 06.06.2000A
Priority number Date
FR9812558 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0993088Global Dossier 18.06.2008B1
EP0993088 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9812558 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69938917D 31.07.2008D1
Priority number Date
FR9812558 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2784515 10.11.2000B1
FR2784515 14.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9812558 07.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6353624 05.03.2002B1
Priority number Date
FR9812558 07.10.1998
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1981136