blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0993088

Designated contracting states DE 
 GB 
 SELapse: 18.09.2008
Examination procedure28.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
European patent granted18.06.2008
Opposition procedure19.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit published on 27.05.2009 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE GB SE
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000919
 
Event date:27.12.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE GB SE
 
Event date:04.10.2006 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:XANTIMA LLC
 
Event date:18.07.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20070614
 
Event date:18.06.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE GB SE
 
Event date:18.06.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69938917
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20080731
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20080918
 
Event date:27.05.2009 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20090319
 
Event date:31.10.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20120925
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:31.01.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20121031
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:25.06.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20131004
 
Event date:24.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69938917 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140501
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20131004
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140501