Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993088

EP0993088 - Semiconductor laser with tunable gain [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.05.2009  [2009/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xantima LLC
2215-B Renaissance Drive, Suite 5
Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US
[2006/40]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31-33, rue de la Fédération
75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pelekanos, Nikolaos
2 Avenue Albert 1er de Belgique
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / Ortiz, Valentin
15 Ter Impasse de Vizille
38000 Grenoble / FR
03 / Mula, Guido
107 Rue de Stalingrad
38100 Grenoble / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstraße 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2006/21]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2006/19]Dendorfer, Claus , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Former [2003/02]Audier, Philippe André , et al
Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/15]Des Termes, Monique , et al
Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402425.504.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateFR1998001255807.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812558
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993088
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993088
Date:18.06.2008
Language:FR
[2008/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/06, H01S5/34
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   SE [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Halbleiterlaser mit einstellbarer Gewinn[2000/15]
English:Semiconductor laser with tunable gain[2000/15]
French:Laser à semiconducteur, à spectre de gain accordable[2000/15]
Examination procedure19.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.02.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
14.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2008Fee for grant paid
28.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08158430.2  / EP1981136
Opposition(s)19.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
15.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE18.09.2008
[2009/07]
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0681200  (PELEKANOS NIKOLAOS THEMELIS [FR]) [DA] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]  HUANG F Y, "QUANTUM-CONFINED FIELD-EFFECT WAVELENGTH TUNING IN A THREE -TERMINAL DOUBLE QUANTUM WELL LASER", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19900604), vol. 56, no. 23, pages 2282 - 2284, XP000149993 [A] 1-5,17,18 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.102940
 [DA]  LIU L Y ET AL, "TUNABLE COUPLED-QUANTUM-WELL LASER CONTROLLED BY AN ELECTRIC FIELD", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19920615), vol. 60, no. 24, pages 2971 - 2973, XP000269913 [DA] 1-5,17,18 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.106780
 [DA]  ORTIZ V ET AL, "EFFICIENT ALL-OPTICAL LIGHT MODULATION IN A PIEZOELECTRIC HETEROSTRUCTURE AT ROOM TEMPERATURE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (19980223), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 963 - 965, XP000742795 [DA] 1-18 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.120935