EP0994218 - Collapsible traffic sign [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franclair Signalisation 275, rue de Clermont Z.A. La Vatine 60000 Beauvais / FR | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charnay, Guy 17, rue du Franc Marché 60000 Beauvais / FR | 02 /
Godin, Denis 15, rue de l'Horloge 60510 LaFraye / FR | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/16] | Debay, Yves Cabinet Yves Debay, 122 Elysée 2 78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402435.4 | 05.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | FR19980012938 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812938 | [2000/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0994218 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0994218 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/012 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
E01F9/688 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | Faltbares Verkehrszeichen | [2000/16] | English: | Collapsible traffic sign | [2000/16] | French: | Panneau de signalisation pliable | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/47] | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR1462688 (SYNTHOR SA) [Y] 8 * figure 1 * [A] 1; | [A]FR1473068 (SODAL SOC) [A] 1-3,7,9,10 * page 1, column 2, line 35 - page 1, column 1, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]FR1542633 (M.E. LUQUET) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * page 1, column 2, line 13 - page 2, column 1, line 7; figure - * [Y] 8; | [A]US4038769 (WERNER WILLIAM A) |