Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994192

EP0994192 - Transformation cassette for yeast [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
La Société Lesaffre et Cie
41, rue Etienne Marcel
75001 Paris / FR
[2000/32]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
LESAFFRE et Cie
41, rue Etienne Marcel
F-75001 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Jürgen
1D, rue Jean-Baptiste Lebas
59239 Thumeries / FR
02 / Nacken, Valérie
97, rue Robert Schuman, Res. Rabelais, Aptt. 22
59700 Marq-en-Baroeul / FR
03 / Loiez, Annie
47, rue Roland
59000 Lille / FR
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Warcoin, Jacques
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Warcoin, Jacques
Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402456.007.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateFR1998001270209.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812702
[2000/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994192
Date:19.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994192
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: A3 RE ???tdavalues.publicationType.A3 RE??? 
No.:EP0994192
Date:30.08.2000
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994192
Date:23.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/81, C12N1/19
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:Transformationskassetten für Hefe[2000/16]
English:Transformation cassette for yeast[2000/16]
French:Cassette de transformation de la levure[2000/16]
Examination procedure11.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
24.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2003Fee for grant paid
27.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
IE23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
[2007/04]
Former [2005/02]AT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
MC31.10.2003
Former [2005/01]AT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
Former [2004/44]AT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
Former [2004/39]AT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY07.10.2003
LU07.10.2003
Former [2004/36]AT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
CY07.10.2003
Former [2004/23]AT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/05]AT23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/03]AT23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/02]GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE23.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2615527  (LESAFFRE SOC IND [FR]) [A] 10 * page 6, line 26 - line 32; figure 5 *;
 [A]  SMITH J. ET AL., "PCR-BASED GENE DISRUPTION IN SACCHAROMYCES - CEREVISIAE", METHODS IN MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 270 - 277, XP002108450 [A] 1-26 * column W *
 [DA]  ALANI E. ET AL., "A method for gene disruption that allows repeated use of URA3 selection in the construction of multiply disrupted yeast strains.", GENETICS, (1987), vol. 116, pages 541 - 545, XP002108451 [DA] 1-26 * column W *
 [A]  WACH A. ET AL., "New heterologous modules for classical or PCR-based gene disruptions in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", YEAST, (1994), vol. 10, no. 13, pages 1790 - 1808, XP002108452 [A] 1-26 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.320101310
 [A]  ZHANG Z. ET AL., "Plasmid stability in recombinant Saccharomyces cerevisiae", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES,GB,ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, (19960101), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 401 - 435, XP004072548 [A] 3,4,22-26 * page 403, paragraph 3 - page 404, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0734-9750(96)00033-X