blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0993181 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0993181



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 106
14.06.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
30.06.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.06.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
08.06.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
08.06.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
01.06.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
01.06.2005 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.06.2005 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.02.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.02.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
04.02.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
04.12.2004 Description Search / examination 2
04.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.08.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
04.08.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.08.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.02.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.11.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.10.2001 Request for change of address Search / examination 2
27.12.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.04.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.04.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
07.04.2000 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
07.04.2000 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
03.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
07.10.1999 Description Search / examination 12
07.10.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.1999 Drawings Search / examination 2
07.10.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
07.10.1999 Priority document Search / examination 20
07.10.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6