blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993181


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.06.2006 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.07.2006  [2006/29]
24.06.2005 (Expected) grant published on  10.08.2005  [2005/32]
17.06.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.06.2005 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.01.2005 Change - German title published on  16.03.2005  [2005/11]
27.01.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.12.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.07.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.07.2004 First examination report
23.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.10.2002 Renewal fee
02.11.2001 Change - applicant published on  19.12.2001 [2001/51]
18.10.2001 Renewal fee
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
11.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
28.04.2000 Request for examination filed published on  14.06.2000 [2000/24]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]