blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0993181

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure04.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted10.08.2005
Opposition procedure11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 19.07.2006 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:14.06.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000406
 
Event date:27.12.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:19.12.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:STMICROELECTRONICS S.A.
 
Event date:15.09.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040804
 
Event date:16.03.2005 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:IMPROVING CHROMATISM OF A PICTURE SUPERIMPOSED ON A VIDEO PICTURE
 
Event date:10.08.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:10.08.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:25.08.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20050825
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:15.09.2005 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69926584
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20050915
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.03.2006 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20060206
 
Event date:19.07.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20060511
 
Event date:26.09.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20060926
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:28.09.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20060928
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.10.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20061031
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:27.07.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20070629
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20061031
 
Event date:25.06.2008 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20071007
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080501
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20071007
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20071007