Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993181

EP0993181 - Improving chromatism of a picture superimposed on a video picture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/15]Method and circuit for improving the chromatism of picture elements superimposed on a video picture
[2005/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.07.2006  [2006/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2001/51]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics SA
7, av. Galliéni
94250 Gentilly / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Vos, Mark
c/o Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur
75116 Paris / FR
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques
Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402462.807.10.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateFR1998001269209.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812692
[2000/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993181
Date:12.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993181
Date:10.08.2005
Language:FR
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/272
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Farbverbesserung eines einem Videobild überlagerten Bildes[2005/11]
English:Improving chromatism of a picture superimposed on a video picture[2005/11]
French:Amélioration du chromatisme d'une image incrustée sur une image vidéo[2005/11]
Former [2000/15]Verfahren und Schaltung zur Färbungsverbesserung von auf einem Videobild überlagerten Bildelementen
Former [2000/15]Method and circuit for improving the chromatism of picture elements superimposed on a video picture
Former [2000/15]Procédé et circuit d'amélioration du chromatisme des éléments d'image incrustés sur une image vidéo
Examination procedure06.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
04.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2005Fee for grant paid
04.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5282037  (EGUCHI HIROYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 7, line 12 - column 14, line 10 *;
 [A]EP0330732  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 31 - column 20, line 42 *;
 [A]WO8606233  (AMPEX [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 2 *;
 [A]US5608464  (WOODHAM DAVID J [GB]) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 62 - column 9, line 61 *