Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994204

EP0994204 - Device for removing underwound yarn wraps from spindles of spinning or twisting machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/16]Dispositif d'élimination du fil de sous-renvidage des broches sur un métier continu à filer ou à retordre
[2000/23]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N. SCHLUMBERGER & CIE
170, rue de la République
F-68500 Guebwiller / FR
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Eidelsberg, Victor Albert
Cabinet Flechner
22, avenue de Friedland
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Eidelsberg, Albert
22, avenue de Friedland
F-75008 Paris / FR
Former [2000/16]Eidelsberg, Victor Albert
20, rue Vignon
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402471.908.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateFR1998001274212.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9812742
[2000/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994204
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication 
No.:EP0994204
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:D01H1/38
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   IT [2001/01]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Beseitigen von Unterwindungen an Spindeln einer Spinn- oder Zwirnmaschine[2000/16]
English:Device for removing underwound yarn wraps from spindles of spinning or twisting machines[2000/23]
French:Dispositif d'élimination du fil de sous-renvidage des broches sur un métier continu à filer ou à retordre[2000/23]
Former [2000/16]Dispositif d'élimination du fil de sous-renvidage des broches sur un métier continu à filer ou à retordre
Former [2000/16]Device for removing underwound yarn wraps from spindles of spinning or twisting machines
Examination procedure22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
16.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2002Fee for grant paid
25.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/45]
06.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2001
31.10.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0730053  (CHEMNITZER SPINNEREIMASCHINEN [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0694634  (MARZOLI & C SPA [IT]) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 1 - line 10 * * column 2, line 38 - line 46 *;
 [A]DE4432502  (SCHURR STAHLECKER & GRILL [DE]) [A] 1-18 * figure - *