Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994342

EP0994342 - Compact system for optical analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYSMEX CORPORATION
1-5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Sysmex Corporation
1-5-1, Wakinohama-Kaigandori, Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0073 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kusuzawa, Hideo
T-REX B-o8, 4-14-8, Kitamachi, Kita-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-1513 / JP
02 / Imura, Yasuyuki
4-16-3-306, Kouji-dai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-2273 / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Hironori
4-16-3-509, Kouji-dai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo 651-2273 / JP
04 / Ishisaka, Masaki
96, Hojo Nagara-cho, Himeji-shi
Hyogo 670-0946 / JP
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc , et al
Cabinet ORES
36, rue de St Pétersbourg
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Jacquard, Philippe Jean-Luc , et al
CABINET ORES, 6, Avenue de Messine
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402517.913.10.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateJP1998029404115.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29404198
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994342
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994342
Date:28.03.2001
[2001/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/84, G01N21/25, G01N21/01
[2001/13]
Former International [2000/16]G01N21/84, G01N21/25
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2001/51]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kompakt-Vorrichtung für optische Analyse[2000/16]
English:Compact system for optical analysis[2000/16]
French:Système compact pour l'analyse optique[2000/16]
Examination procedure04.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
04.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9745718  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 4, line 12 - line 17 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, line 18 - line 22 * * page 6, line 20 - line 25 * * page 12, line 27 - line 32 * * figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 2,3,8,9;
 [Y]EP0841555  (SPECTRONIC INSTR INC [US]) [Y] 2,3,8,9 * column 1, line 26 - line 35 * * column 3, line 15 - line 34 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 11 * * column 4, line 12 - line 22 * * column 5, line 12 - line 38 * * figures 2,3,5 *;
 [XP]US5943122  (HOLMES DUANE C [US]) [XP] 1,5 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 28 *;
 [E]WO9960380  (CEPHEID [US]) [E] 1,6,7 * page 23, line 15 - line 23 * * page 24, line 2 - line 24 * * page 27, line 19 - line 28 * * figures 7-10 *;
 [A]GB2133901  (MO I NEFTECHIMITSCHESKOJ I GAS, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 96 - line 114 * * page 1, line 122 - line 126 * * page 2, line 70 - line 75 * * figures 1-9 *