Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000754

EP1000754 - Method and device for predicting the quantity of printing product available in a printer and necessary for printing a document [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 31.08.2011  [2011/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON EUROPA N.V.
Bovenkerkerweg 59-61
1185 EG Amstelveen / NL
[2010/20]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Canon Europa N.V.
Bovenkerkerweg 59-61
1185 EG Amstelveen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Moreau, Jean-Jacques
91b, rue de Dinan
35000 Rennes / FR
02 / Lorgeoux, Mickael
8, square de la Grande Charbonnière
35700 Rennes / FR
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Rinuy, Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date99402575.719.10.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateFR1998001331523.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9813315
FR1998001331623.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9813316
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1000754
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1000754
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000754
Date:19.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175, B41J29/393
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/09]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Abschätzen der Menge von Tinte in einem Drucker und erforderlich für einen Druckauftrag[2000/20]
English:Method and device for predicting the quantity of printing product available in a printer and necessary for printing a document[2000/20]
French:Procédé et méthode pour estimer la quantité de produit d'impression disponible dans l'imprimante et nécessaire pour l'impression d'un document[2000/20]
Examination procedure11.01.2001Examination requested  [2008/48]
29.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2010Fee for grant paid
26.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
20.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
22.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
29.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.01.2001DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2001
09.01.2001FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2001
09.01.2001GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.2001
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
09.01.2001M01   Fee paid on   11.01.2001
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR02.11.2010
[2011/35]
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH0888706  ;
 [XA]JPS58181680  ;
 [XA]EP0707969  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,15,29 * page 22, line 25 - page 23, line 19; figures 13,14; claims 52-57,63 * * page 28, line 19 - line 21 * [A] 10,12,13,66;
 [XA]JPS62125384  ;
 [X]JPH023357  ;
 [X]JPH0640011  ;
 [X]EP0593282  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,15,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5160966  (SHIINA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,10,13,15,24,27,29 * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 44; figure 1 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5794094  (BOOCKHOLDT DARIUS [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6,7,15-17,20,21,29,41,45,46,57 * column 4, line 46 - column 10, line 7; figures 2-4 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5802420  (GARR CHARLES MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1,13,15,27,29 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 7; figures 1,3,5; claims 1,8 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5724627  (OKUNO YUKIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,15,29 * column 6, line 41 - line 49; figures 1,3 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5202769  (SUZUKI TADAOMI [JP]) [A] 1,15,29;
 [A]US5729351  (OH YOUNG-DALL [KR]) [A] * figure 3 * * abstract *;
 [A]JPH05330196  ;
 [A]GB2311437  (CANON KK [JP])
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 096, no. 008, [X] 1,15,29 * abstract * [A] 10,12,13,24
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840131), vol. 008, no. 022, Database accession no. (M - 272), [X] 1,15,29 * abstract * [A] 2,3,6,7,10,16,20,24,41,45,57,61,66
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871110), vol. 011, no. 342, Database accession no. (P - 635), [X] 1,15,29 * abstract * [A] 10,12
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900313), vol. 014, no. 132, Database accession no. (M - 0948), [X] 1,15,29 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940517), vol. 018, no. 258, Database accession no. (M - 1606), [X] 1,15,29 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940315), vol. 018, no. 154, Database accession no. (M - 1577), [A] * abstract *
by applicantUS4413264
 GB2302309
 US5636032
 WO1997EP00366