Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995839

EP0995839 - Mixing and surfacing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.07.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2004  [2004/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COLAS
7, Place René Clair
92653 Boulogne-Billancourt Cédex / FR
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Kilner, David Nicholas
Dragons Farms, Shipley
West Sussex RH13 8PD / GB
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Michelet, Alain , et al
Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP
14-16, rue Ballu
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Michelet, Alain , et al
Cabinet Harlé et Phélip, 7, rue de Madrid
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402593.020.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateGB1998002333823.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9823338
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995839
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995839
Date:07.11.2001
[2001/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:E01C19/46, E01C19/10
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
Extension statesRO07.05.2002
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Mischen und Beschichten[2000/17]
English:Mixing and surfacing apparatus[2000/17]
French:Dispositif de mélange et de revêtement[2000/17]
Examination procedure07.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/28]
18.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/36]
02.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5178486  (PERRIN MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 1-6,8-17 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - line 53 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 17; figure 3 *;
 [Y]EP0771910  (MEUNIER JACQUES [FR]) [Y] 1-6,8-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3301441  (WERNER PETER J, et al) [Y] 15-17 * column W *