Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998165

EP0998165 - Method for ATM data transmission within a mobile satellite system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue de la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Magnier, Anne
14, rue de la Butte aux Cailles
75013 Paris / FR
02 / Peligry, Yves
16, rue Saint Antoine
75004 Paris / FR
03 / Baudoin, Cédric
36, avenue Marcel Langer
31400 Toulouse / FR
04 / Lapaille, Cédric
5, Place Maurice Berteaux
78400 Chatou / FR
05 / Calot, Guillaume
28 rue Henri de Regnier
78000 Versailles / FR
06 / Cohen, Michel
49, rue Basfroi
75011 Paris / FR
07 / Rouffet, Denis
16, rue Louis Pasteur
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
54 Rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402602.921.10.1999
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateFR1998001337326.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9813373
[2000/18]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998165
Date:03.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum vermitteln von ATM-Informationen in einem mobilen Satellitensystem[2000/18]
English:Method for ATM data transmission within a mobile satellite system[2000/18]
French:Procédé de transmission de données en mode de transfert asynchrone dans un système de satellites mobile[2000/18]
Examination procedure03.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
11.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/22]
27.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0805568  (TRW INC [US]) [Y] 1,3,10,11,16 * abstract * * figures 1,2A-1,2B * * column 1, line 45 - line 57 * * column 2, line 12 - line 24 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 24 * * column 6, line 37 - line 59 * * claim 1 * [A] 2,4,12-15;
 [Y]  AKYILDIZ I F ET AL, "SATELLITE ATM NETWORKS: A SURVEY", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (19970701), vol. 35, no. 7, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 30 - 43, XP000695129 [Y] 1,3,10,11,16 * figures 1,2,9 * * page 34, column 2, line 1 - line 49 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.601740
 [A]  BITO J ET AL, "Multipath fading effects on integrated video, voice and data transmission in hybrid-code BPSK-DS/CDMA systems", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (19980401), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 0923-5965, page 183-192, XP004121508 [A] 1,5,7,9 * abstract * * page 186, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 187, column 2, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-5965(97)00064-7