Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995743

EP0995743 - Derivatives of dihydro- and tetrahydrochinoline as a medicinal antioxydans [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
22, rue Garnier
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]For all designated states
LES LABORATOIRES SERVIER
22, rue Garnier
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1 rue Carle Hébert
92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Casara, Patrick
740 Chemin Pré Seigneur
78670 Villennes sur Seine / FR
02 / Dorey, Gilbert
21 avenue du Maréchal Douglas Haig
78000 Versailles / FR
03 / Lestage, Pierre
9 Allée de la Grande Terre
78170 la Celle Saint Cloud / FR
04 / Lockhart, Brian
60 rue des Ponts
78290 Croissy sur Seine / FR
[2000/17]
Application number, filing date99402624.322.10.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateFR1998001330623.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9813306
[2000/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995743
Date:26.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995743
Date:02.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D221/20, A61K31/47, C07D215/20, C07D471/10, C07D401/06, // (C07D471/10, 221:00, 221:00)
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
Extension statesAL03.11.1999
LT03.11.1999
LV03.11.1999
MK03.11.1999
RO03.11.1999
SI03.11.1999
TitleGerman:Dihydro- und Tetrahydrochinolinderivate als medizinisches Antioxydans[2000/17]
English:Derivatives of dihydro- and tetrahydrochinoline as a medicinal antioxydans[2000/17]
French:Dérivés de dihydro- et tétrahydroquinoléine en tant qu'antioxydant médical[2000/17]
Examination procedure03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
30.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2002Fee for grant paid
15.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:SearchJPH09301953  [ ] (SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO CO);
 [X]US4305932  (MENACHEMOFF EMIL, et al) [X] 1,3,4,9 * column 1 - column 5 *;
 [A]EP0350304  (INT ASS OF FISH MEAL MANUFACTU [GB], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [X]  - SUZUKI, TOMOO ET AL., "Preparation of malonic acid diamides as antiarteriosclerotics.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980202), vol. 128, no. 5, Database accession no. 48145q, XP002107502 [X] 1-4 * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002107505 [ ] * composé avec RN 199186-57-7 *
 [X]  - DE, DIBYENDU ET AL., "Novel synthesis of 6,7-dialkoxy-2,2-dialkyl-3-hydroxyethyl-1,2,3,4-tetrahydroquinolines.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900730), vol. 113, no. 5, Database accession no. 40418a, XP002107503 [X] 1-4 * abstract *
    [] - DATABASE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002107506 [ ] * composé with RN 128154-74-5 *
    [] - INDIAN J. CHEM., SECT. B, vol. 29B(1), pages 70 - 71,
 [X]  - VASILLA PARTALI ET AL., "Photo-Emde Degradation of 1,2,3,4-Tetrahydroquinolinium Salts", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA., BASEL CH, vol. 68, pages 1952 - 1960, XP002107501 [X] 1-4 * page 1957, ligne 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19850680721
 [A]  - SHMULOVICH, V. G. ET AL., "Study of the antioxidant activity of inhibitors of the oxidation of paraffin oil hydrocarbons.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19800505), vol. 92, no. 18, Database accession no. 149667e, XP002107504 [A] 1,2 * abstract *
    [] - NEFTEKHIMIYA, vol. 19, no. 6, pages 912 - 920,