Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1029765

EP1029765 - Children's wagon with anti-tipping bolster [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RADIO FLYER INC.
6515 West Grand Avenue
Chicago, IL 60635 / US
[2000/34]
Inventor(s)01 / McQueeny, Thomas Patrick
4732 North Manor
Chicago, Illinois 60625 / US
02 / Pasin, Robert
1120 North Linden Avenue
Chicago, Illinois 60302 / US
03 / Schrader, Brent
2440 Dunham Street
Clinton, Iowa 52732 / US
04 / Michelau, Frederick J.
6661 Marshall Drive
Des Plaines, Illinois 60016 / US
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR
Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam
75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date99402673.027.10.1999
[2000/34]
Priority number, dateUS1999025099816.02.1999         Original published format: US 250998
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1029765
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1029765
Date:18.10.2000
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B62B3/00, B62B5/00
[2000/34]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/27]
Former [2000/34]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kinderwagen mit Anti-kipp- Achstäger[2000/34]
English:Children's wagon with anti-tipping bolster[2000/34]
French:Chariot d'enfant avec support d'essieu anti-renversement[2000/34]
Examination procedure19.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/13]
28.09.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/13]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.06.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.06.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.06.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]CH259009  (MOTOR COLUMBUS AKTIENGESELLSCH [CH]) [X] 1,4,5,7 * the whole document *;
 [DY]US4744575  (TONELLI ROGER [US]) [DY] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 6 - line 29; figures 2,4 *;
 [Y]EP0854077  (KIMURA UNITY CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4 * column 5, line 32 - line 40; figure 7 *;
 [A]DE29722538U  (SCHMIDT HERWIG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * claim 9 *
by applicantUS4744575