Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1005241

EP1005241 - Method for communication between a mobile terminal and an accessory [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 16.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED
Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road, Tsim Sha Tsui,Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
[N/P]
Former [2005/43]For all designated states
TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED
Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road, Tsim Sha Tsui,Kowloon
Hong Kong / CN
Former [2005/32]For all designated states
TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED
Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road
Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
Former [2005/31]For all designated states
TAM Holdings Limited
Room 1502, 15/F.,Tower 6 China Hong Kong City, 33 Canton Road
Tsim Sha Tsui, Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue de la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Parisel, Arnaud
3, rue Salneuve
75017 Paris / FR
02 / Dugast, Xavier
8, rue Auguste Renoir, Appartement 131
78400 Chatou / FR
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Feray, Valérie , et al
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony Cedex / FR
Former [2005/10]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 44-52, rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Former [2000/22]Lamoureux, Bernard , et al
COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402753.005.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateFR1998001487626.11.1998         Original published format: FR 9814876
[2000/22]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1005241
Date:31.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005241
Date:26.10.2005
Language:FR
[2005/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/32
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Kommunikationsverfahren zwischen einem mobilen Endgerät und dem Zubehör[2000/22]
English:Method for communication between a mobile terminal and an accessory[2000/22]
French:Procédé de communication entre un terminal mobile et un accessoire[2000/22]
Examination procedure30.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
11.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2005Fee for grant paid
22.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
05.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.10.2005
CY05.11.2005
MC30.11.2005
LU26.12.2005
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
[2007/21]
Former [2006/38]AT26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
DK26.01.2006
GR26.01.2006
Former [2006/34]AT26.10.2005
MC30.11.2005
DK26.01.2006
Former [2006/30]MC30.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9008447  (SUPERIOR ELECTRONIC DEV PTY LT [AU]) [X] 1,5,11,15 * page 7, line 16 - page 9, line 22 * [Y] 4,14,16;
 [YA]EP0830044  (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [Y] 4,14,16 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 15 * [A] 1,11;
 [A]US5722071  (BERG ROGER WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 2, line 38 - line 59 *;
 [A]US5404391  (WAVROCH DANIEL P [CA], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 9 - line 39 * * column 6, line 28 - line 43 *;
 [A]  SMITHSON G, "Introduction to digital modulation schemes", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON DESIGN OF DIGITAL CELLULAR HANDSETS (REF. NO.1998/240), IEE COLLOQUIUM ON DESIGN OF DIGITAL CELLULAR HANDSETS (REF. NO.1998/240), LONDON, UK, 4 MARCH 1998, 1998, London, UK, IEE, UK, pages 2/1 - 9, XP002111698 [A] 2,12 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 5 *