Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001531

EP1001531 - Surface acoustic wave device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2011
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.12.2011  [2011/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/42]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Horikawa, Katsuhiro
C/O Murata Man. Co., Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / Ando, Akira
C/O Murata Man. Co., Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date99402795.110.11.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateJP1998031890210.11.1998         Original published format: JP 31890298
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001531
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001531
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H03H9/02
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/09]
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Akustische Oberflächenwellenanordnung[2000/20]
English:Surface acoustic wave device[2000/20]
French:Dispositif à ondes acoustiques de surface[2000/20]
Examination procedure24.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/20]
15.12.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
21.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/49]
07.07.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201012   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS59218028  ;
 [A]JPS5631213  ;
 [DA]EP0833446  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - MICHIO KADOTA ET AL, "CERAMIC RESONATORS USING BGS WAVES", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, SUPPLEMENTS,JA,JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO, (19920101), vol. 31, no. SUPPL. 31-1, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 219 - 221, XP000322504 [A] 1,3,11 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850418), vol. 009, no. 089, Database accession no. (E - 309), [A] 1,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810529), vol. 005, no. 082, Database accession no. (E - 059), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - HIDEAKI ADACHI, "SAW Properties of PLZT Epitaxial Thin Films", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, SUPPLEMENTS., JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS. TOKYO., JA, (1985), vol. 24, no. 24, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 121 - 123, XP002135933 [A] 1 * paragraph [0001] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.24.121
by applicantJPH04336708
    - KADOTA ET AL., "Ceramic resonators using BGS waves", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PROC. ITH SYMPOSIUM ON ULTRASONIC ELECTRONICS, (1992), vol. 31, pages 31 - 1,