blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1002962

EP1002962 - Device for securing a fixing element [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FRANCE TELECOM
6 Place d'Alleray
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
FRANCE TELECOM
6, Place d'Alleray
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Hillereau, Bertrand
La Remelière
85430 Nieul le Dolent / FR
02 / Fenninger, Jean-Pierre
1037, route de Saint Jean de Braye
45400 Semoy / FR
03 / Montigny, Gilles
609, rue de Verdun
45160 Saint Hilaire Saint Mesmin / FR
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Peaucelle, Chantal, et al
Cabinet Armengaud Aîné
3, Avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]Peaucelle, Chantal, et al
Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2000/21]Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al
Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date99402865.218.11.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateFR1998001456619.11.1998         Original published format: FR 9814566
[2000/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002962
Date:24.05.2000
Language:FR
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:F16B41/00
[2000/21]
CPC:
F16B41/005 (EP); F16B23/0069 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/06]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Sicherung eines Befestigungselements[2000/21]
English:Device for securing a fixing element[2000/21]
French:Dispositif de sécurisation pour organe de solidarisation[2000/21]
Examination procedure05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/31]
24.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/22]
10.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2128282  (HAWKE CABLE GLANDS LTD) [Y] 1-7,9 * page 1, line 91 - line 122; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US4258596  (BISBING ROBERT H, et al) [Y] 1-7,9 * column 3, line 21 - line 56 * * column 4, line 31 - line 45; figures 3,6 *;
 [A]WO8909886  (KINDUE TELECOMMUNICATIONS LIMI [GB]) [A] 1,3,9 * figures 1-3; claims 2,6,7 *;
 [AD]DE9404928U  (CONFON AG RHEINECK [CH]) [AD] 1-9 * page 6, line 13 - page 8, line 21; figures 1-6 *;
 [AD]FR2587422  (BLIMEX [FR]) [AD] 1-9 * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 6; figures 1-8 *;
 [A]EP0427237  (KYOEI IND [JP]) [A] 1,3-5,7 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2669975  (HEMA SCHRAUBEN BEFESTIGUNG [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 24 - line 30; figure . *;
 [A]EP0070247  (ACCESSOIRES AUTOMOBILES [FR]) [A] 1,7 * page 6, line 5 - line 16; figures 1-6 *
by applicantDE9404928U
 FR2587422
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.