blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1005153

EP1005153 - Surface acoustic wave filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/42]
Former [2007/02]For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Taniguchi, Norio, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
(A170) Intel. Prop. Dep., 26-10 Tenjin, 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date99402919.724.11.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateJP1998033327924.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33327998
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1005153
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1005153
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1005153
Date:10.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2000
ClassificationIPC:H03H9/64
[2000/22]
CPC:
H03H9/6483 (EP,US); H03H9/64 (KR); H03H9/25 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2001/40]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Akustisches Oberflächenwellenfilter[2000/22]
English:Surface acoustic wave filter[2000/22]
French:Filtre à ondes acoustiques de surface[2000/22]
Examination procedure02.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/22]
18.07.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.11.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
22.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2006Fee for grant paid
27.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI10.01.2007
FR10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]FI10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
FR31.08.2007
Former [2008/17]FI10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
Documents cited:Search[LE]DE19923962  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [LE] 1-4,6,12,14-19 * priority; page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 33; figures 1A,1B,10,12 *;
 [A]WO9819394  (FLOWERS JAMES EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6-9,12,14,16,21,22 * page 2, lines 1-9; figure 1 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 9; figures 9,10 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 11 *;
 [A]EP0788224  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 21,22 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 6; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.