EP1018636 - Optical fibre gyroscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SFIM INDUSTRIES 13 avenue Marcel Ramolfo Garnier 91300 Massy / FR | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Audren, Jean Thierry 5, Rue des Ecoles 78470 St. Rémy les Chevreuse / FR | 02 /
Roosen, Gerald 3, Rue de la Guiloire 78720 La Celle les Bordes / FR | 03 /
Delaye, Philippe 257 Rue du Faubourg Saint Martin 75010 Paris / FR | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99403321.5 | 30.12.1999 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | FR19990000023 | 05.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900023 | [2000/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018636 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018636 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
G01C19/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2001/13] |
Former [2000/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optischer Faserkreisel | [2000/28] | English: | Optical fibre gyroscope | [2000/28] | French: | Gyroscope à fibre optique | [2003/34] |
Former [2000/28] | Gyroscopes à fibre optique | Examination procedure | 29.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 09.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2754893 (SFIM IND [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4944591 (MCMICHAEL IAN C [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |