Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969584

EP0969584 - Non-insulated low voltage switched-mode power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
29, Boulevard Romain Rolland
92120 Montrouge / FR
[2001/51]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics S.A.
7, Avenue Galliéni
94250 Gentilly / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Ravon, Jean-Michel
Chemin du Jas de Bassas
13710 Fuveau / FR
[2000/01]
Representative(s)de Beaumont, Michel
1, rue Champollion
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date99410084.029.06.1999
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateFR1998001316916.10.1998         Original published format: FR 9813169
FR1998000843029.06.1998         Original published format: FR 9808430
[2000/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969584
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/155
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/37]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nichtisoliertes Niederspannungsschaltnetzteil[2000/01]
English:Non-insulated low voltage switched-mode power supply[2000/01]
French:Alimentation à découpage basse tension non-isolée[2000/01]
Examination procedure17.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
06.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/27]
06.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200810   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2743954  (INT RECTIFIER CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19612365  (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 31; figures 1,2 *