Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0981140

EP0981140 - Immersed transformer self-protected by a device comprising a circuit breaker and fuses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS
89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[N/P]
Former [2002/35]For all designated states
Schneider Electric Industries SAS
89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Schneider Electric Industries SA
89 boulevard Franklin Roosevelt
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Schneider Electric Industries SA
40, avenue André Morizet
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Wild, Jacques, Schneider Electric Industries SA
Service Propriété Industrielle
38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR
02 / Fulchiron, Didier, Schneider Electric Ind. SA
Service Propriété Industrielle
38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR
03 / Preve, Christophe, Schneider Electric Ind. SA
Service Propriété Industrielle
38050 Grenoble cedex 09 / FR
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Ritzenthaler, Jacques , et al
Schneider Electric Industries SA Service Propriété Industrielle - A 7
38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Ritzenthaler, Jacques , et al
Schneider Electric Industries SA Service Propriété Industrielle - A 7
38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR
Application number, filing date99410089.926.07.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateFR1998001051914.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810519
[2000/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0981140
Date:23.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0981140
Date:28.01.2004
Language:FR
[2004/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/40, H01H71/10
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   GR,   IT,   SE [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Eingetauchter Transformator selbsttätig geschützt durch eine Anordnung mit Lastschalter und Schmelzsicherungen[2000/08]
English:Immersed transformer self-protected by a device comprising a circuit breaker and fuses[2000/08]
French:Transformateur immerge auto-protege par un dispositif incluant un disjoncteur et des fusibles[2000/08]
Examination procedure20.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
29.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2003Fee for grant paid
18.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
05.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US3599135  (GRYCTKO CARL E) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 45 - column 8, line 8 *;
 [X]US3292048  (SWOISH WILLIAM R, et al) [X] 2 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 47 *;
 [A]JPH07255122  ;
 [A]US3666992  (GOODMAN ERNEST A);
 [A]US3210604  (NELSON ROLLAND D);
 [A]JPH0819173  ;
 [A]FR1162262  (MERLIN GERIN);
 [AD]EP0468299  (SACHSENWERK LICHT & KRAFT AG [DE])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, [A] * abstract *